Hansen, Mark Gilbert (CPSO#: 93255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Bureau 2D123
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

qiqktani general hospital
Iqaluit NU  X0A 1H0
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK GILBERT HANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012