Hansen, Miriam Johanna (CPSO#: 76170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: (705) 728-3757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nay ( CPSO# 76285 )
Dr. M. Hansen ( CPSO# 76170 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 739-5661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM JOHANNA HANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005