Hanson, Garth John (CPSO#: 74752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 hospital drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 5078
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Garth Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hanson ( CPSO# 74752 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5078

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7735

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
815 High Street East
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARTH JOHN HANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004