Hanson, Mary Kathryn (CPSO#: 30804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: Ferriman, Mary Kathryn (used until: 28 Jul 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
49 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1K6
Phone: (416) 588-7084
Fax: (416)922-9006
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanson ( CPSO# 30804 )

Business Address:
Suite 504
49 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1K6
Phone Number: (613) 588-7084

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY KATHRYN HANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1979