Hanson, Paul Russell (CPSO#: 65864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Mar 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Keil Dr S
Chatham ON  N7M 3H3
Phone: (519) 358-7158
Fax: (519) 358-7194
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2475 MCDOUGALL ST
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Canada
Phone: (519)966-0089
Fax: (519)966-5622
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hanson ( CPSO# 65864 )

Business Address:
125 Keil Drive South
Chatham ON  N7M 3H3
Phone Number: (519) 358-7158

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1992
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 4)
            As  from  February  22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr. Paul Russell Hanson,
            in accordance with an undertaking  and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Hanson  to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. PAUL RUSSELL HANSON
                                          ("Dr. Hanson")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule  2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act,  1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints  and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS"  means the Drug Program Services Branch, the  Narcotics  Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public  Register"  means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hanson, certificate  of  registration number 65864, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received  information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake to abide by the  provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Hanson, undertake to practise  under  the  guidance  of  a
                        clinical supervisor(s)  acceptable  to  the  College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Hanson,  acknowledge  that  I have reviewed  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached  hereto  as Appendix "A", and
                        understand  what  is  required  of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education Plan ("IEP"),  attached  hereto  as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my  Practice  Location,  or  another location
                              approved by the College, once every week for the first month,
                              and once every month thereafter;
                  
                        (iii) Review  at  least  ten  (10)  of my patient charts  at  every
                              meeting during the first month,  and ten (10) to fifteen (15)
                              charts at every meeting thereafter;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make  recommendations  to  me for practice  improvements  and
                              ongoing  professional  development   and   inquire   into  my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform  any  other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews  with  staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical  Supervisor(s)  deem  necessary   to   my   Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit  written  reports  to  the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the  Clinical  Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Hanson,  acknowledge  that  the charts reviewed  shall  be
                        selected  by  the Clinical Supervisor(s)  based  on  the  areas  of
                        concern identified  in  the report(s) of the assessor dated January
                        17, 2017 and April 25, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake  to  cooperate  fully  with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my  practice,  conducted  under  the  term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to  abide  by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited  to,  any  recommended  practice  improvements  and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Hanson,  undertake  to  ensure  that  Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking  is signed and delivered to the College  within  thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hanson,  undertake  that  if  a  person  who  has  given  an
                        undertaking  in  Appendix  "A"  to  this  Undertaking  is unable or
                        unwilling  to  continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall,  within
                        twenty (20) days  of  receiving  notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from  a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake that if I am  unable  to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections  (4)(e)  and/or
                        (f)  above,  I will cease practising medicine until such time as  I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Hanson,  acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section  (4)(g)  above  this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate  of registration and that
                        term,  condition  or  limitation  will be included  on  the  public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake that, approximately  six  (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in  section  (4)
                        above  and  Appendix  "A"  to  this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the  Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors   selected  by  the  College  (the   "Assessor(s)").    I
                        acknowledge that  the  Reassessment  may  include  a  chart review,
                        direct  observation  of  my  care,  interviews with colleagues  and
                        co-workers,  feedback  from patients and  any  other  tools  deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr. Hanson, acknowledge  that  my  Clinical  Supervisor(s)  may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with  the  Assessor(s)  any  issues  or  concerns  arising from the
                        Reassessment.    I  also  acknowledge  that  the  results  of   the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations  are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of  the recommendations within which
                        to  provide  the College with my submissions  in  this  regard.   I
                        further  acknowledge   that  thereafter,  the  ICR  Committee  will
                        consider my submissions  and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations,  or  any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so,  whether  they,  or  any  of them,  constitute  limitations  or
                        restrictions on my practice, and  that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide  by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hanson, hereby consent to the  following  being  included on
                        the  public  register  as  terms,  conditions or limitations on  my
                        certificate of registration, for the  purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any  recommendations  of  the  Assessor(s)   which   the  ICR
                              Committee  has  identified  in  its  decision  referenced  in
                              section  (6)(d)  as  terms,  conditions  or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake to inform the College of  each  and  every
                        location  that  I  practise  or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited  to,  hospital(s),  clinic(s)   and   office(s),   in   any
                        jurisdiction  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing  this  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake  to  inform the College  of  any  and  all  new  Practice
                        Locations within  five  (5)  days  of  commencing  practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hanson, undertake that I will submit to, and  not  interfere
                        with,  unannounced  inspections  of  my  Practice  Location(s)  and
                        patient  records  by  a  College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hanson, give my irrevocable  consent  to the College to make
                        appropriate  enquiries  of  OHIP,  NMS  and/or any  person  who  or
                        institution that may have relevant information,  in  order  for the
                        College  to  monitor  my  compliance  with  the  provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP  and  NMS
                        consent  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I,  Dr.  Hanson,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible for payment  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived  my  right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,  at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr.  Hanson,  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I,  Dr. Hanson, acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hanson, acknowledge that,  during  the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking  shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Hanson, acknowledge that, in addition to this  Undertaking
                        being  posted   in  accordance  with  section  (14)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A  reassessment  of  Dr.  Hanson's  practice  was  conducted  as  a
                        component  of  a Specified  Continuing  Education  and  Remediation
                        Program. As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                              *     Dr.  Hanson  will  practise  under  the  guidance  of a
                                    Clinical  Supervisor  acceptable  to the College for 12
                                    months. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Hanson's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months  of  the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Hanson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide  the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes  of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information  arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising  from  the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Hanson, give my irrevocable consent  to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College  has  that  led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I,  Dr. Hanson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my  completion  of  the  Professional  Education,  and  to  all  Clinical
                  Supervisors,  Chiefs  of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the  purposes  of  monitoring  my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which  comes  to  their attention in the course  of  providing  the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (2 of 4)
            As from March 21, 2011, the following  is  imposed  as  a  term,  condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Russell  Hanson,
            in  accordance  with  an  undertaking  and  consent  given by Dr. Hanson to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Hanson  may not prescribe narcotic drugs, narcotic  preparations  or
                  benzodiazapines/other  targeted  substances, as amended from time to time
                  in the governing regulations.  Dr.  Hanson  is permitted by Health Canada
                  to  prescribe  controlled  drugs,  but has voluntarily  agreed  with  the
                  College that the only controlled drug  he  will  prescribe  is Androgenic
                  Steroid Replacement.
                  
            (3 of 4)
            As  from  April  16,  2009,  the following is imposed as a term, condition  and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr. Paul Russell Hanson,
            in accordance with the undertaking  and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Hanson to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            a.    Dr. Hanson's practice is restricted as follows: 
                  i.    to   not  prescribe  narcotics  or  targeted  substances  including
                        Fentanyl and Versed;  
                  ii.   to not  perform  any  surgical  procedures including all procedures
                        performed on the male and female genitourinary tracts; and, 
                  iii.  to perform only minor cosmetic procedures  including Botox cosmetic
                        injections, collagen cosmetic injections, and  the  removal of skin
                        tags, warts and moles. 
            b.    Dr. Hanson shall not perform any cosmetic procedures beyond  those listed
                  in subparagraph (iii) above before: 
                        (a) notifying the College as required under the changing  scope  of
                        practice 
                        policy; and, 
                        (b)  meeting  the  expectations  and  requirements  set  out in the
                        changing 
                        scope of practice policy for changing scope of practice. 
            c.    Dr. Hanson will review all advertising with respect to my practice  or my
                  clinic before it is released and will not authorize publication unless it
                  conforms  with  published  regulations and College policies in respect of
                  advertising.


            (4 of 4)
            As from February 22, 2007, Dr. Paul Russell Hanson consents to the following to
            be  imposed  as  a  term,  condition  and  limitation  on  his  certificate  of
            registration:

                  Dr.  Paul  Russell  Hanson  may  not  prescribe   narcotics  or  targeted
                  substances  (including  benzodiazepines).   Dr.  Paul Russell  Hanson  is
                  permitted  by  Health  Canada  to  prescribe controlled  drugs,  but  has
                  voluntarily agreed with the College that the only controlled drug he will
                  prescribe is Androgenic Steroid Replacement.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 May 2009
Summary:

 On May 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Hanson to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and in that 
 he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee directs that:

1. 	Dr. Hanson appear 
 before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register.

2. 	Dr. 
 Hanson pay costs to the College in the amount of $3650 within thirty (30) days from the date of 
 this Order.

3. 	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 11, 2009


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Aug 2001
Summary:

 On August 27, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Hanson(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he falsified a record relating to his practice.  The 
 Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	The Discipline Committee orders that Dr. Hanson 
 attend before it to be reprimanded, 	with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register.

2.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Hanson(s certificate 
 of 	registration for a period of six months, three months of which be suspended if Dr. Hanson 
 	completes a course in ethics approved by the Registrar no later than March 1, 2002, all 	costs of 
 the course to be borne by Dr. Hanson.

3.	The Discipline Committee orders that the suspension of 
 Dr. Hanson(s certificate of 	registration commence on or before October 29, 2001.

4.	The 
 Discipline Committee orders that Dr. Hanson pay costs to the College in the amount 	of $2,500.00 
 by December 31, 2001.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 27, 2001

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Russell Hanson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 22, 2018:

A reassessment of Dr. Hanson’s practice was conducted as a component of a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Hanson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Hanson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of March 20, 2018, Dr. Paul Hanson completed the requirements of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Note: This matter has been confirmed by HPARB.
Download Full Document (PDF)