Hanson, Peter George (CPSO#: 24782)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter G. Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2014

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1971 to 14 Jun 1972
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015