Hansson, Ann Martha (CPSO#: 66034)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: German, Swedish

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1992 to 27 Oct 1992
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 28 Oct 1992 to 24 Nov 1992
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004