Hao, Desiree (CPSO#: 71260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2002