Haq, Aamir Saleem (CPSO#: 93267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakefront Clinics
550 Queens Quay West
Toronto ON  M5V 3M8
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Fax: (647) 347-9348
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: (416) 620-7667
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aamir Saleem Haq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haq ( CPSO# 93267 )

Business Address:
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 626-2138

Business Address:
Lakefront Clinics
550 Queens Quay West
Toronto ON  M5V 3M8
Phone Number: (647) 347-0576

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AAMIR SALEEM HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012