Haq, Farzana (CPSO#: 87259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Integra Health Centre
1320-130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: 416-777-9365
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3000-181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 507-6600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARZANA HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009