Haq, Rashida (CPSO#: 33732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
2-Donnelly Wing ,Room 2085
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5912
Fax: (416) 864-5175
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashida Haq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Haq ( CPSO# 33732 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
2- Donnelly Wing, Room 2085
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5912

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHIDA HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982