Haqqi, Mohammad Nowzad Ismail (CPSO#: 86959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Malay

Education:International Islamic Univ. Malaysia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victorial Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie, ON
L4M 6M2
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-728-9802
Fax: 705-302-0115
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Bell Farm Rd.
Barrie ON  L4M6L2
Canada
Phone: 7057351111
Fax: 7057351888
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Haqqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haqqi ( CPSO# 86959 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Department of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Suite 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Simcoe ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD NOWZAD ISMAIL HAQQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012