Haque, Azizul (CPSO#: 86867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Fax: (519) 455-2262
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Mental Health Association
Huron Street Site
648 Huron Street
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 434-9191
Fax: (519) 438-1167
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haque Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngo ( CPSO# 86553 )
Dr. A. Haque ( CPSO# 86867 )

Business Address:
First Episode Mood
and Anxiety Program
London Health Sciences Centre
860 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H8
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Business Address:
648 Huron Street
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 434-9191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZIZUL HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012