Haque, Muhammed Samiul (CPSO#: 67163)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006