Harczy, Martha (CPSO#: 63272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centrepointe Medical Consultants
106 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6B1
Phone: (613) 224-6151 Ext. 31
Fax: (613) 224-7228
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARTHA HARCZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARCZY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jan 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991