Harding, John Patrick Dalton (CPSO#: 101842)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017