Harding, Kevin Patrick (CPSO#: 33684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin County Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin P. Harding Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Harding ( CPSO# 33684 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin County Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK HARDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1982