Harding, Peter William (CPSO#: 57067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: Hrdina, Peter William (used until: 02 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
879 Shefford Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 8H9
Phone: (613) 741-6904
Fax: (613) 741-0021
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter W. Harding Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Harding ( CPSO# 57067 )

Business Address:
879 Shefford Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 8H9
Phone Number: (613) 741-6904

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM HARDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1990