Harding, Rita Yvonne (CPSO#: 31126)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998