Harding, Sheila Margaret Rutledge (CPSO#: 51547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Rutledge, Sheila Margaret (used until: 02 Feb 1984 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1988