Hardy, Douglas Vann (CPSO#: 30689)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CPM Health Centre Unit B22 550 Terminal Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Z3
Date Received: 21 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014