Hardy, Paul Edmund (CPSO#: 57157)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 2007