Hardy, Stephen Peter (CPSO#: 54139)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015