Hardy-St-Pierre, Godefroy (CPSO#: 87362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GODEFROY HARDY-ST-PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDY-ST-PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2010 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016