Harel, Ziv (CPSO#: 81083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Nephrology
61 Queen Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 8462
Fax: (416) 363-9338
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z Harel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Harel ( CPSO# 81083 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Nephrology
Suite 7-030
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIV HAREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAREL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008