Hares, Mark Michael (CPSO#: 54624)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St.Bartholomew's Hospital Medical Coll., 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2013