Hargadon, John Michael (CPSO#: 50681)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 128 Regent Street, Thunder Bay, ON, P7A 5G9
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016