Hargreaves, James Aubrey (CPSO#: 66130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1997