Harild, Laura Diane (CPSO#: 88507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5143
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA DIANE HARILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARILD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011