Harji, Fayaz G (CPSO#: 76069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rockyview General Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
7007 14th Street Southwest
Calgary AB  T2V 1P9
Phone: (403) 943-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAYAZ G HARJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003