Harle, Ingrid Anita (CPSO#: 50682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Norwegian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Palliative Care Medicine
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone: (613) 548-2485
Fax: (613) 548-2436
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ingrid A. Harle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Harle ( CPSO# 50682 )

Business Address:
Queen's Palliative Care Medicine
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2485

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID ANITA HARLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986