Harley, Anne Margareta (CPSO#: 69950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Elizabeth Bruyere Hospital
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4066
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Harley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Harley ( CPSO# 69950 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Continuing Care
Elizabeth Bruyere Hospital
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARGARETA HARLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998