Harley, Ian James Graham (CPSO#: 80406)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2004 to 29 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006