Harmon, Christopher Gordon (CPSO#: 32399)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014