Haroon, Ayesha (CPSO#: 88102)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010