Haroon, Nigil (CPSO#: 88065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2012

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
1E - 425
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5634
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nigil Haroon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nigil Haroon ( CPSO# 92245 )
Dr. N. Haroon ( CPSO# 88065 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Rheumatology
399 Bathurst Street
1EW-425
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5634

Business Address:
Suite M277
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 675-4791

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2008 to 23 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nigil Haroon may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Rheumatology,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr.
                        Haroon  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Haroon  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Haroon's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Haroon's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on February 1, 2012.  In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 31, 2019.