Haroun, James Anthony (CPSO#: 70456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Kensington Rd
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 793-2170
Fax: (905) 793-5770
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James A. Haroun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haroun ( CPSO# 70456 )

Business Address:
Yonge & Balmoral X-Ray & Ultrasound
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M4T 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 975-8951

Business Address:
Dufferin/Rosemount
1615 Dufferin Street
104-105 Basement
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (416) 656-5353

Business Address:
Waterloo Nuclear and Radiography
18-826 King Street North
Waterloo ON  N2J 4G8
Phone Number: (519) 206-7777

Business Address:
Lindsay Ultrasound and X-Ray
Kent Place Mall
105-189 Kent Street
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Y8
Phone Number: (705) 328-2400

Business Address:
Sarnia Diagnostic Imaging
102-704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 491-8377

Business Address:
Armdale X-Ray, Ultrasound & Cardiology Clinic
7720 Markham Road
Unit 3
Markham ON  L3S 3K1
Phone Number: (905) 554-7333

Business Address:
AG X-Ray & Ultrasound Services
2901 Markham Road
Unit 9
Toronto ON  M1X 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 538-0707

Business Address:
Trinity Medical Imaging
1255 The Queensway
Unit 16A
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 253-5111

Business Address:
Bramalea Medical Centre
206 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 793-5858

Business Address:
Gam X-Ray
225 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9

Business Address:
Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
B1- 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-0014

Business Address:
St. Clair & Dufferin Nuclear
1223 St Clair West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 656-6034

Business Address:
Dufferin/Rosemount
1615 Dufferin Street
104-105 Basement
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (416) 656-5353

Business Address:
College and Markham X Ray
Basement 4
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 925-3823

Business Address:
Oakville Nuclear Diagnostic
B4-1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 815-8590

Business Address:
College and Markam Nuclear
B3-474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 925-3823

Business Address:
St Clair X Ray and Ultrasound
1223 St Clair West
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 656-6034

Business Address:
Dufferin X Ray and Ultrasound
204-1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H5
Phone Number: (416) 652-5557

Business Address:
Bathurst St. Clair Radiology
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J1
Phone Number: (416) 537-9565

Business Address:
College & Grace X Ray
622 College Street
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M6G 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 534-6868

Business Address:
Lawrence & Black Creek Ultrasound
208-1635 Lawrence Avenue
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 244-8862

Business Address:
Dufferin X Ray and Ultrasound
B1-1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 656-7400

Business Address:
Oakville Diagnostics
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-0014

Business Address:
Park Med X Ray
8-592 Rathburn Road
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 793-5858

Business Address:
Airport & Steeles X Ray
208- 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 793-5858

Business Address:
Yonge and Eglinton Xray & Ultrasound
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500-150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-3624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ANTHONY HAROUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAROUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001