Harper, Kelly Marie (CPSO#: 65463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gates Medical Center
Suite 15
300 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6Z9
Phone: (905) 509-4595
Fax: (905) 509-4597
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KELLY MARIE HARPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993