Harpur, George Edward (CPSO#: 63668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 357-5333
Fax: (905) 357-0668
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George E. Harpur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Harpur ( CPSO# 63668 )

Business Address:
301 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 357-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE EDWARD HARPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992