Harrad, Upninderjit Singh (CPSO#: 63067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 141
1959-152nd Street
Surrey BC  V4A 9E3
Phone: (604) 542-1190
Fax: (604) 542-1191

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UPNINDERJIT SINGH HARRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 17 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 05 Feb 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1997