Harries, Didi Vladimira (CPSO#: 64402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Names: Harries, Vladimira (used until: 21 Jul 1996 )     Skuherska, Vladimira Didi (used until: 09 Aug 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Palacky, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006