Harrigan, William Ross (CPSO#: 50685)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Woodstock and Area Community Health Centre 35 Metcalf Street Woodstock, ON N4S 3E6
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015