Harrington, Brian David (CPSO#: 82267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6507
Fax: (705) 740-6891
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian D. Harrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Harrington ( CPSO# 82267 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6507

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID HARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2005 to 12 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 13 May 2005 to 16 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006