Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Harrington, Leah Dawn (CPSO#: 62555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westway Medical Clinic
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-7617
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 244-7617
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leah Harrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harrington ( CPSO# 62555 )

Business Address:
Westway Medical Clinic
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-7617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH DAWN HARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRINGTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1992