Harris, George Charles (CPSO#: 22343)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Wilczek, George Charles (used until: 27 Nov 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003