Harris, Leonard (CPSO#: 61116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3532 Commerce Court
Burlington ON  L7N 3L7
Phone: (905) 333-9402
Fax: (905) 333-0872
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leonard Harris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harris ( CPSO# 61116 )

Business Address:
3532 Commerce Court
Burlington ON  L7N 3L7
Phone Number: (905) 333-9402

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Virgin Islands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 21 Feb 1994 to 06 Mar 1994
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990