Harris, Meera (CPSO#: 91167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: Surti, Meera (used until: 01 Dec 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rivlin Medical Group
Suite 312
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: 905-281-9143
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Harris ( CPSO# 91404 )
Dr. M. Harris ( CPSO# 91167 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 402
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-5452

Business Address:
Rivlin Medical Group
Suite 312
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
First Floor East Wing
Room 1E449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5267

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013