Harris, Robin John (CPSO#: 50687)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004