Harris, William Alexander (CPSO#: 71388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheng ( CPSO# 71164 )
Dr. W. Harris ( CPSO# 71388 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
984 Oilver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALEXANDER HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002