Harrison, David Andrew (CPSO#: 58585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 615-1441
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. A. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Harrison ( CPSO# 58585 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 615-1441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988